Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Orazio Cardinal Spínola

Deceased

Archbishop of Genova

Cardinal-Priest of San Biagio dell’Anello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1547BornGenoa
20 Dec 160054.0AppointedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
1 Apr 160154.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Genova, Italy
11 Sep 160659.7Elevated to Cardinal
11 Jan 161669.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Biagio dell’Anello
24 Jun 161669.5DiedArchbishop of Genova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Orazio Spínola:
Cardinal Orazio Spínola (died ) Archbishop of Genova

  • a bishop for 15.2 years
  • a cardinal for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 11 Sep 1606
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 207

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013