Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Baltasar de Heredia, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Cagliari


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Feb 1536AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Urgell, Spain
11 Feb 1536AppointedTitular Bishop of Ceraunia
6 Jul 1541AppointedBishop of Bosa, Italy
31 Aug 1548AppointedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
21 Apr 1558ResignedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
4 Nov 1558³DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Cagliari, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Baltasar de Heredia:
Archbishop Baltasar de Heredia O.P. (died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Cagliari

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 137, and Page 146
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 184
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1500, Page 47, Number 242

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 17 Nov 2013