Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vittore Soranzo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bergamo, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Jul 1544AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Bergamo, Italy
19 Jan 1547SucceededBishop of Bergamo, Italy
1552¹ResignedBishop of Bergamo, Italy
15 May 1558DiedBishop Emeritus of Bergamo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vittore Soranzo (VIAF: 46502522)
Bishop Vittore Soranzo (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bergamo

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1544, Number 18*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 132
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1547, Number 10*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast