Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Soffietti, C.R.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Adria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1675BornScio
19 Sep 169924.0Ordained PriestPriest of Clerics Regular Minor
5 Feb 171640.3AppointedBishop of Chioggia, Italy
9 Feb 171640.4Ordained BishopBishop of Chioggia, Italy
19 Jan 173357.3AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
7 Sep 174771.9DiedBishop of Adria, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Soffietti:
Bishop Giovanni Soffietti C.R.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Adria

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 161
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 21 Sep 2013