Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giacomo Cardinal Simonetta

Deceased

Administrator of Nepi e Sutri, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Apollinare


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1475Born
17 Jul 152853.5AppointedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
28 Dec 152853.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
28 Dec 152853.9Ordained PriestPriest
14 Sep 152954.7Ordained BishopBishop of Pesaro, Italy
21 May 153560.3Elevated to Cardinal
31 May 153560.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Ciriaco alle Terme Diocleziane
20 Dec 153560.9AppointedBishop of Perugia, Italy
4 Aug 153661.5AppointedBishop of Lodi, Italy
20 Jun 153762.4ResignedBishop of Lodi, Italy
28 Nov 153762.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Apollinare
10 Dec 153762.9ResignedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
6 Feb 153863.0AppointedAdministrator of Nepi e Sutri, Italy
20 Jul 153863.5ResignedBishop of Perugia, Italy
1 Nov 153964.8DiedAdministrator of Nepi e Sutri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Simonetta (VIAF: 32341289)
Giacomo Cardinal Simonetta (born 1475, died ) Administrator of Nepi e Sutri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 10.8 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
  • a cardinal for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 May 1535
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 271, and Page 306
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 220, and Page 274
  • od/op/c01: CB, 12 Dec 2017
  • od/op/c01: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast