Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Raimbaud de Simiane

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Apt, France


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Sep 1556AppointedBishop of Vence, France
7 Feb 1560AppointedBishop of Apt, France
1571¹ResignedBishop of Apt, France
23 Sep 1584DiedBishop Emeritus of Apt, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Raimbaud de Simiane
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Raimbaud de Simiane (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Apt

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 328, and Page 112
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1556, Number 21*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018