Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Silva y Tenorio, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Badajoz, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Nov 1445AppointedBishop of Lugo, Spain
1447AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
27 Mar 1447AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
19 Oct 1461AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
20 Jan 1479DiedBishop of Badajoz, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Silva y Tenorio
Bishop Pedro Silva y Tenorio O.P. (died ) Bishop of Badajoz

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 99, and Page 181
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 209

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast