Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Sierra

Deceased

Bishop of Segovia


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Jan 1367AppointedBishop of Orense, Spain
3 Oct 1370AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
16 Feb 1374DiedBishop of Segovia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Sierra:
Bishop Juan Sierra (died ) Bishop of Segovia

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 119, and Page 443
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 304, Number 164

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014