Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gómez Manrique

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Aug 1348AppointedBishop of Tui, Spain
8 Jun 1351AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
2 May 1362AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
19 Dec 1375DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gómez Manrique:
Archbishop Gómez Manrique (died ) Archbishop of Toledo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 487, and Page 200
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 501

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 28 Jan 2014