Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Reinhard von Sickingen

Deceased

Bishop of Worms


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1417²Born
9 Mar 144629.2AppointedBishop of Worms, Germany
27 Jul 144629.6Ordained BishopBishop of Worms, Germany
12 Aug 148265.6DiedBishop of Worms, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Reinhard von Sickingen:
Bishop Reinhard von Sickingen (died ) Bishop of Worms

  • a bishop for 36.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,878
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 270

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013