Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthias von Rammung

Deceased

Bishop of Speyer


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1417BornHeidelberg
4 Jul 146447.5SelectedBishop of Speyer, Germany
8 Aug 146447.6ConfirmedBishop of Speyer, Germany
28 Dec 146448.0Ordained BishopBishop of Speyer, Germany
1 Aug 147861.6DiedBishop of Speyer, Germany

MicroData Summary for Matthias von Rammung:
Bishop Matthias von Rammung (died ) Bishop of Speyer

  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,613

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013