Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Siegfried von Venningen

Deceased

Bishop of Speyer


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1402Born
30 Mar 145553.2SelectedBishop of Speyer, Germany
24 May 145553.4ConfirmedBishop of Speyer, Germany
7 Nov 145654.8Ordained BishopBishop of Speyer, Germany
2 Sep 145957.7DiedBishop of Speyer, Germany

MicroData Summary for Siegfried von Venningen:
Bishop Siegfried von Venningen (died ) Bishop of Speyer

  • a bishop for 2.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 241
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,606

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013