Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Scrope, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Dromore, Ireland

Auxiliary Bishop of Canterbury, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1400¹Born
1450²50.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
12 Jan 145050.0AppointedBishop of Dromore, Ireland
1 Feb 145050.0Ordained BishopBishop of Dromore, Ireland
1455¹55.0ResignedBishop of Dromore, Ireland
1469²69.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
1477²77.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
15 Jan 149191.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Dromore, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Scrope (VIAF: 54503698)
Bishop Thomas Scrope O. Carm. (born 1400, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Dromore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBradley
Ordained BishopSanta Maria in Aquiro, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 40.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 146
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1450, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Aug 2018

Quantcast