Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Angelo Cardinal Capranica

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1415¹BornRome
17 Mar 143823.2AppointedArchbishop of Manfredonia, Italy
5 May 144732.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
2 Jul 144732.5InstalledBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
25 Sep 145035.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Rieti, Italy
5 Mar 146045.2Elevated to Cardinal
26 Mar 146045.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
Dec 1468²53.9ResignedBishop of Rieti, Italy
11 Dec 147257.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
9 Apr 147358.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Fermo, Italy
17 Jun 147459.5ResignedBishop of Fermo, Italy
3 Jul 147863.5DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Capranica:
Cardinal Angelo Capranica (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

  • a cardinal for 18.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 5 Mar 1460

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013