Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alessio de Cesari

Deceased

Archbishop of Benevento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1395¹BornSiena
7 Jan 143742.0AppointedBishop of Chiusi, Italy
8 Jan 143843.0Ordained BishopBishop of Chiusi, Italy
5 Mar 146267.2AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
31 Jul 146469.6DiedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessio de Cesari:
Archbishop Alessio de Cesari (died ) Archbishop of Benevento

  • a bishop for 26.6 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,601

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013