Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Schulte (von Gultenhaus), O.S.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

Bishop of Syra (Suda)


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Oct 1455AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
13 Oct 1455AppointedBishop of Syra (Suda)
23 Oct 1466AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
15 Jun 1489DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johannes Schulte (von Gultenhaus) (VIAF: 316511610)
Bishop Johannes Schulte (von Gultenhaus) O.S.A. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReichenbach
Death PlaceEschwege

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 243
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,455, Number 30*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast