Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Hermann von Schaumberg

Deceased

Former Bishop-Elect of Minden, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Nov 1545Born
9 Jan 156721.1SelectedBishop of Minden, Germany
29 May 157327.5ConfirmedBishop of Minden, Germany
29 Jan 158236.2ResignedBishop-Elect of Minden, Germany
5 Mar 159246.3DiedFormer Bishop-Elect of Minden, Germany

MicroData Summary for Hermann von Schaumberg
Father Hermann von Schaumberg (born , died ) Former Bishop-Elect of Minden

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 245
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1573

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast