Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Paolo Savio

Deceased

Bishop of Adria, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1587¹Born
5 Jul 162740.5AppointedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
25 Jul 162740.5Ordained BishopBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
29 May 162841.4AppointedBishop of Feltre, Italy
19 Dec 163952.9AppointedBishop of Adria, Italy
Oct 1650³63.7DiedBishop of Adria, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Paolo Savio
Bishop Giovanni Paolo Savio (born 1587, died Oct 1650) Bishop of Adria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenice

  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 69, and Page 185
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 314
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1627, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast