Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Erich von Sachsen-Lauenburg

Deceased

Bishop of Münster, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1472Born
150230.0SelectedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
2 Dec 150230.9ConfirmedBishop of Hildesheim, Germany
1504²32.0ResignedBishop-Elect of Hildesheim, Germany
24 Feb 150836.1SelectedBishop of Münster, Germany
16 Aug 150836.6ConfirmedBishop of Münster, Germany
150937.0Ordained BishopBishop of Münster, Germany
20 Oct 152250.8DiedBishop of Münster, Germany

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Erich von Sachsen-Lauenburg (VIAF: 15523170)
Bishop Erich von Sachsen-Lauenburg (born 1472, died ) Bishop of Münster

  • a bishop for 13.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 247
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1502, Number 38*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 165

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 16 Apr 2018