Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Ruiz de Colmenero

Deceased

Bishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1596¹BornBudia, Spain
25 Jun 164650.5AppointedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
Dec 1647³51.9Ordained BishopBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
24 Dec 164752.0InstalledBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México
28 Sep 166367.7DiedBishop of Guadalajara, Jalisco, México

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Ruiz de Colmenero:
Bishop Juan Ruiz de Colmenero (died ) Bishop of Guadalajara

  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,420
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 198
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 177, Number 1,101

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 20 Jan 2014