Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francisco Gómez Cardinal Rojas de Sandoval

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Sisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1553BornValladolid, Spain
26 Mar 161865.2Elevated to Cardinal
Mar 162168.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
162269.0Ordained PriestPriest
17 May 162572.4DiedCardinal-Priest of San Sisto

MicroData Summary for Francisco Gómez Rojas de Sandoval:
Cardinal Francisco Gómez Rojas de Sandoval (died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Sisto

  • a priest for 3.4 years
  • a cardinal for 7.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Mar 1618

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013