Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Salvador Rodríguez Castelblanco, T.O.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Orihuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1657²BornPalermo, Italy
12 Sep 171760.7SelectedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
22 Nov 171760.9ConfirmedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
13 Feb 171861.1Ordained BishopBishop of Orihuela, Spain
20 Jun 172770.5DiedBishop of Orihuela, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Salvador Rodríguez Castelblanco:
Bishop Salvador Rodríguez Castelblanco T.O.R. (died ) Bishop of Orihuela

  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 298
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 36, Number 119

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 17 Oct 2013