Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jean Baptist Rene, S.J. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Alaska, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1841Born
187634.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
16 Mar 189755.5AppointedPrefect of Alaska, USA
28 Mar 190462.5ResignedPrefect of Alaska, USA
6 Apr 191674.6DiedPrefect Emeritus of Alaska, USA

MicroData Summary for Jean Baptist Rene
Father Jean Baptist Rene S.J. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Alaska

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontrevaux Anjou, France

  • a priest for 40.2 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast