Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Margarit

Deceased

Bishop of Gerona


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Jun 1534AppointedBishop of Gerona, Spain
29 Nov 1534Ordained BishopBishop of Gerona, Spain
21 Oct 1554DiedBishop of Gerona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Margarit:
Bishop Juan Margarit (died ) Bishop of Gerona

  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,213
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 202
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,382
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,324

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013