Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Maria Resta, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1661BornMilano
26 Dec 168423.3Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Congregation of the Most Holy Saviour of the Lateran
15 Dec 170443.3AppointedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
21 Dec 170443.3Ordained BishopBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
31 Mar 170644.6DiedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Maria Resta:
Bishop Filippo Maria Resta C.R.L. (born , died ) Bishop of Alessandria (della Paglia)

  • a priest for 21.2 years
  • a bishop for 1.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 77
  • ob: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1704, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015