Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maciej Pstrokoński

Deceased

Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1563¹Born
19 Mar 160138.2AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
1603²40.0Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
5 Nov 160845.8AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
30 Jun 160946.4DiedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Maciej Pstrokoński
Bishop Maciej Pstrokoński (born 1563, died ) Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

  • a bishop for 6.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 288, and Page 372
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1603, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast