Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Power

Deceased

Bishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1765²Born
18 Jun 179126.4Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jan 180439.0AppointedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
25 Apr 180439.3Ordained BishopBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
27 Jan 181651.0DiedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Power
Bishop John Power (born 1765, died ) Bishop of Waterford and Lismore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWaterford
Ordained PriestMalines
Ordained BishopHoly Trinity, Cathedral

  • a priest for 24.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1804, Number 7
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 400
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,208
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 115

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast