Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Betrand Cardinal du Pouget

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1280¹BornCastelnau-Montratier
17 Dec 131636.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
17 Dec 131636.9Elevated to Cardinal
18 Dec 132747.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
3 Feb 135272.0DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Betrand du Pouget:
Betrand Cardinal du Pouget (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

  • a cardinal for 35.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Dec 1316

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015