Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Ponce de Léon

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1510²BornCórdoba
27 Jun 155040.4AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
26 Jan 156050.0AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
17 Jan 157363.0DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Ponce de Léon:
Bishop Pedro Ponce de Léon (died ) Bishop of Plasencia

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 62, Number 354
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 168, and Page 275

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015