Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Pignatelli

Deceased

Bishop of Minervino Murge


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1676BornNapoli
6 Jun 170528.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
19 Dec 170529.4Ordained PriestPriest
8 Feb 171942.5AppointedBishop of Minervino Murge, Italy
25 Jun 171942.9Ordained BishopBishop of Minervino Murge, Italy
28 Oct 173458.2DiedBishop of Minervino Murge, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Pignatelli:
Bishop Nicola Pignatelli (born , died ) Bishop of Minervino Murge

  • a priest for 28.8 years
  • a bishop for 15.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 269
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1719, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015