Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Angelo Pichi (Pico)

Deceased

Bishop of San Miniato


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Nov 1638AppointedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
14 Nov 1638Ordained BishopArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
23 Nov 1648AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of San Miniato, Italy
12 Dec 1653DiedBishop of San Miniato, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Pichi (Pico):
Archbishop Angelo Pichi (Pico) (died ) Bishop of San Miniato

  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 80, and Page 244
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 102, Number 618

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013