Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cunerus Petri

Deceased

Bishop of Leeuwarden, Netherlands

Auxiliary Bishop of Münster


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1531¹Born
16 Sep 156938.7AppointedBishop of Leeuwarden, Netherlands
13 Nov 156938.8Ordained BishopBishop of Leeuwarden, Netherlands
Jan 158049.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
15 Feb 158049.1DiedBishop of Leeuwarden, Netherlands

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cunerus Petri (VIAF: 42732629)
Bishop Cunerus Petri (born 1531, died ) Bishop of Leeuwarden

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDueve Dijke, Bronsvarshaven Zelande
Ordained BishopSte Catherine, Malines
Death PlaceKöln, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 223
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1569, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast