Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georgius Perpignani

Deceased

Bishop of Canea (Cydonia, Egée)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1555¹BornCreten
14 Nov 159439.9AppointedBishop of Tinos, Greece
20 Nov 159439.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tinos, Greece
15 Jul 161964.5AppointedBishop of Canea (Cydonia, Egée), Greece
1621¹66.0DiedBishop of Canea (Cydonia, Egée), Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Georgius Perpignani:
Bishop Georgius Perpignani Bishop of Canea (Cydonia, Egée)

  • a bishop for 26.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 72, and Page 337
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 33, Number 166
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 313

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013