Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann von Berkentin

Deceased

Bishop of Ratzeburg, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
31 Mar 1479AppointedBishop of Ratzeburg, Germany
11 Apr 1479Ordained BishopBishop of Ratzeburg, Germany
15 Jun 1511DiedBishop of Ratzeburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann von Berkentin (VIAF: 80663155)
Bishop Johann von Berkentin (died ) Bishop of Ratzeburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDassow
Ordained BishopSanta Maria del Anima, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 32.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 221
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,375
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 282
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,479, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast