Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal Pallotti

Deceased

Prefect of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1829Born
16 Nov 188051.6AppointedSubstitute (Sostituto) of the Secretariat of State
29 Oct 188253.5AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
31 Jul 188556.3ResignedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
23 May 188758.1Elevated to Cardinal
26 May 188758.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres
20 Feb 188959.8AppointedPrefect of the Roman Curia - Other
31 Jul 189061.3DiedPrefect of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Luigi Pallotti (VIAF: 304917793)
Luigi Cardinal Pallotti (born , died ) Prefect of Roman Curia - Other

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlbano Laziale, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 3.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 55
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 23 May 1887
  • x933/xsta: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 23, and Page 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast