Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio de Pago

Deceased

Bishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro


Events

DateEventTitle
12 Jan 1451AppointedBishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia
20 Jan 1451Ordained BishopBishop of Ossero (Osor), Croatia
29 Mar 1471AppointedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro

MicroData Summary for Antonio de Pago
Bishop Antonio de Pago , Bishop of Kotor (Cattaro)

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Marc, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 77, and Page 122
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,593
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1451, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast