Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Legnamine (de Padua)

Deceased

Bishop of Belluno e Feltre


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1400¹Born
8 Aug 144646.6AppointedBishop of Ferrara, Italy
8 Jan 144747.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ferrara, Italy
18 Apr 146060.3AppointedBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy
11 Jan 146262.0DiedBishop of Belluno e Feltre, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Legnamine (de Padua):
Bishop Francesco Legnamine (de Padua) (died ) Bishop of Belluno e Feltre

  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 153, and Page 103
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120, Number 10,762
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,550

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013