Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michele Orsi

Deceased

Archbishop of Otranto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1673BornIsernien
169723.5Ordained PriestPriest
2 Mar 172248.7AppointedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
8 Mar 172248.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Otranto, Italy
Jun 175278.9DiedArchbishop of Otranto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Orsi:
Archbishop Michele Orsi (born ) Archbishop of Otranto

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 223

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013