Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Orsi, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cesena, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1668³Born
26 Dec 171143.5Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
21 Mar 172556.7AppointedBishop of Cesena, Italy
25 Mar 172556.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cesena, Italy
15 Nov 173466.4ResignedBishop of Cesena, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Orsi (VIAF: 89316437)
Bishop Giovanni Battista Orsi C.O. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Cesena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForlì

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 134
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast