Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Orlandi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Giovinazzo e Terlizzi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1713BornTricafe
Dec 173623.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
24 Apr 175238.4AppointedBishop of Giovinazzo e Terlizzi, Italy
30 Apr 175238.4Ordained BishopBishop of Giovinazzo e Terlizzi, Italy
25 Apr 177662.4DiedBishop of Giovinazzo e Terlizzi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Orlandi:
Bishop Giuseppe Orlandi O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Giovinazzo e Terlizzi

  • a priest for 39.4 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1767
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013