Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrzej Oporowski

Deceased

Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1440¹Born
5 Oct 147636.7AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
1 Oct 147939.7AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
12 Oct 148141.7AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
Apr 1483²43.2DiedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Oporowski (VIAF: 29311252)
Bishop Andrzej Oporowski (born 1440, died Apr 1483) Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 219, and Page 270
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1476, Number 36*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 23 Nov 2018

Quantcast