Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrzej Opaliński

Deceased

Bishop of Poznań


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1575¹Born
30 Aug 160631.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Poznań, Poland
30 Aug 160631.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Sinopoli
31 Oct 160732.8SucceededBishop of Poznań, Poland
19 Dec 162348.9DiedBishop of Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrzej Opaliński:
Bishop Andrzej Opaliński (died ) Bishop of Poznań

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 287, and Page 315
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1606, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 10 Feb 2015