Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Olivier, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Angers, France


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Jul 1532AppointedBishop of Angers, France
8 Sep 1532Ordained BishopBishop of Angers, France
12 Apr 1540DiedBishop of Angers, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Olivier
Bishop Jean Olivier O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Angers

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSainte-Catherine du Val des Ecoliers, Church, Paris, Diocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 7.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,322
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1532, Number 11
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 108

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 29 Jun 2018

Quantcast