Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel Francisco Navarrete y Ladrón de Guevara

Deceased

Archbishop of Burgos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1645²BornEl Ciego
1 Jun 169954.4AppointedBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
Jul 1699³54.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mondoñedo, Spain
18 May 170560.4AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
11 Aug 172378.6DiedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Francisco Navarrete y Ladrón de Guevara:
Archbishop Manuel Francisco Navarrete y Ladrón de Guevara (died ) Archbishop of Burgos

  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 130, and Page 269
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 241, Number 1,492

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013