Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Nogales Dávila

Deceased

Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1652²Born
8 Jun 170755.4AppointedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
7 Oct 170856.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
9 Jul 172169.5DiedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Nogales Dávila
Bishop Pedro Nogales Dávila (born 1652, died ) Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZalamea de la Serena, Spain

  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 382
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 27, Number 57
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1708, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast