Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Teodorico Cardinal Ranieri

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Sep 1295AppointedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
4 Dec 1298AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Croce in Gerusalemme
4 Dec 1298Elevated to Cardinal
13 Jun 1299AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
7 Dec 1306DiedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

MicroData Summary for Teodorico Ranieri:
Teodorico Cardinal Ranieri (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

  • a cardinal for 8.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 4 Dec 1298

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 31 Jan 2014