Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Nicolini

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Amalfi

Titular Archbishop of Athenae


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Oct 1475AppointedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
26 Apr 1482ResignedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
26 Apr 1482AppointedTitular Archbishop of Athenae
29 Apr 1482AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Verdun, France

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Nicolini:
Archbishop Giovanni Nicolini Archbishop Emeritus of Amalfi

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 86, and Page 98
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 269

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013