Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Néez, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Comana Armeniae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1680Born
8 Oct 173858.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam
8 Oct 173858.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Comana Armeniae
22 Nov 173959.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Comana Armeniae
19 Oct 176484.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Louis Néez
Bishop Louis Néez M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVerneuil, France

  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 37
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 159, and Page 455

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast