Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas (a Sestri) Bottaro, O.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam

Titular Bishop of Nyssa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1664¹Born
1692¹28.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
18 Mar 171652.2AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam
18 Mar 171652.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Nyssa
7 Mar 171955.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nyssa
14 Aug 172157.6SucceededVicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam
8 Aug 173773.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}, Viet Nam

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas (a Sestri) Bottaro
Bishop Thomas (a Sestri) Bottaro O.P. (born 1664, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Eastern Tonking {Tonkino Orientale}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSestri de Ponente, Italy

  • a priest for 45.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 295
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1719, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 6 Jul 2018

Quantcast