Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Marie Deveaux, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}

Titular Bishop of Lerus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1711¹BornSaint-Malo, France
15 Feb 174534.1AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam
15 Feb 174534.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Lerus
1 May 174635.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lerus
1 Jan 175645.0DiedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis-Marie Deveaux:
Bishop Louis-Marie Deveaux M.E.P. (born 1711, died ) Coadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}

  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1746, Number 16
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 260, and Page 455

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015